19/05/2015, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,19/05/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
20/05/2015, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,20/05/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
17/05/2016, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,17/05/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
18/05/2016, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,18/05/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
16/05/2017, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,16/05/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
17/05/2017, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,17/05/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
15/05/2018, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,15/05/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
16/05/2018, 19:00 |
Annual Council ,16/05/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
11/03/2015, 19:00 |
Cabinet - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,11/03/2015, 19:00 |
In attendance |
24/09/2014, 19:00 |
Council ,24/09/2014, 19:00 |
Present |
22/10/2014, 19:00 |
Council ,22/10/2014, 19:00 |
Present |
26/11/2014, 19:00 |
Council ,26/11/2014, 19:00 |
Present |
21/01/2015, 19:00 |
Council ,21/01/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
18/02/2015, 19:15 |
Council ,18/02/2015, 19:15 |
Present |
17/06/2015, 19:00 |
Council ,17/06/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
29/07/2015, 19:00 |
Council ,29/07/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
23/09/2015, 00:00 |
Council ,23/09/2015, 00:00 |
Present |
21/10/2015, 19:00 |
Council ,21/10/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
16/12/2015, 19:00 |
Council ,16/12/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
27/01/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,27/01/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
17/02/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,17/02/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
16/03/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,16/03/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
29/06/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,29/06/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
27/07/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,27/07/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
21/09/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,21/09/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
19/10/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,19/10/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
23/11/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,23/11/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
14/12/2016, 19:00 |
Council ,14/12/2016, 19:00 |
Present |
25/01/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,25/01/2017, 19:00 |
Apologies received |
15/02/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,15/02/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
29/03/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,29/03/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
28/06/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,28/06/2017, 19:00 |
Apologies received |
26/07/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,26/07/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
20/09/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,20/09/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
18/10/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,18/10/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
22/11/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,22/11/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
13/12/2017, 19:00 |
Council ,13/12/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
24/01/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,24/01/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
21/02/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,21/02/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
21/03/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,21/03/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
13/06/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,13/06/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
25/07/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,25/07/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
10/10/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,10/10/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
14/11/2018, 19:00 |
Council ,14/11/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
09/01/2019, 19:00 |
Council ,09/01/2019, 19:00 |
Present |
20/02/2019, 19:00 |
Council ,20/02/2019, 19:00 |
Present |
03/04/2019, 19:00 |
Council ,03/04/2019, 19:00 |
Present |
18/02/2015, 19:00 |
Extraordinary Council ,18/02/2015, 19:00 |
Present |
15/05/2018, 19:00 |
Extraordinary Council ,15/05/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
27/01/2015, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,27/01/2015, 19:00 |
Absent |
08/07/2015, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,08/07/2015, 19:00 |
Apologies, sent representative |
21/01/2016, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,21/01/2016, 19:00 |
Apologies, sent representative; Substituted by Councillor Cameron Beart |
07/07/2016, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,07/07/2016, 19:00 |
Apologies, sent representative |
27/10/2016, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,27/10/2016, 19:00 |
Absent |
07/09/2017, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,07/09/2017, 19:00 |
Expected |
12/09/2017, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,12/09/2017, 19:00 |
Present |
19/04/2018, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,19/04/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
12/07/2018, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,12/07/2018, 19:00 |
Present |
02/10/2018, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,02/10/2018, 19:00 |
Absent |
09/04/2019, 19:00 |
General Licensing Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,09/04/2019, 19:00 |
Present |
06/03/2014, 19:00 |
Licensing Act 2003 Committee - Decommisioned 18.05.2022 ,06/03/2014, 19:00 |
Expected |
22/07/2015, 18:00 |
Licensing Act 2003 Committee - Decommisioned 18.05.2022 ,22/07/2015, 18:00 |
Apologies received |
03/12/2015, 19:00 |
Licensing Act 2003 Committee - Decommisioned 18.05.2022 ,03/12/2015, 19:00 |
Apologies received |
14/04/2016, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,14/04/2016, 10:00 |
Present |
31/10/2016, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,31/10/2016, 10:00 |
Present |
20/04/2017, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,20/04/2017, 10:00 |
Present |
24/07/2017, 14:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,24/07/2017, 14:00 |
Present |
24/07/2017, 15:30 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,24/07/2017, 15:30 |
Present |
01/08/2017, 14:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,01/08/2017, 14:00 |
Present |
08/08/2017, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,08/08/2017, 10:00 |
Present as substitute |
23/08/2017, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,23/08/2017, 10:00 |
Present |
23/10/2018, 10:00 |
Licensing Sub-Committee ,23/10/2018, 10:00 |
Present |
21/06/2018, 19:00 |
Planning Committee ,21/06/2018, 19:00 |
Present as substitute |
05/09/2017, 10:00 |
Planning Working Group ,05/09/2017, 10:00 |
In attendance |
09/07/2018, 10:00 |
Planning Working Group ,09/07/2018, 10:00 |
In attendance |
29/01/2020, 19:00 |
Policy Development and Review Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,29/01/2020, 19:00 |
In attendance |
23/09/2021, 19:00 |
Scrutiny Committee - Decommissioned 18.05.2022 ,23/09/2021, 19:00 |
In attendance |
26/11/2020, 13:30 |
Standards Hearing Sub-Committee ,26/11/2020, 13:30 |
In attendance |